EP0918436 - Conversion of decoded interlaced video into progressive scanning system taking account of scanning system before coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/21] | Scanning system convertion into progressive scanning system regardless of scanning system before coding | ||
[2011/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acer Incorporated 8F, 88, Sec. 1 Hsin Tai Wu Road Hsichih, Taipei Hsien 221 / TW | [2009/27] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibano, Motoyoshi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2012/02] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
Shibano, Motoyoshi c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/21] | 01 /
Shibano, Motoyoshi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/21] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121030.5 | 05.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | JP19970321597 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32159797 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0918436 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0918436 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918436 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
H04N7/012 (EP,US);
H04N19/16 (EP,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/21] | H04N5/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2000/51] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umwandlung von ins Zeilensprung-System dekodiertem Video in Vollbild-Video unter Berücksichtigung des Abtastsystems vor Kodierung | [2011/21] | English: | Conversion of decoded interlaced video into progressive scanning system taking account of scanning system before coding | [2011/21] | French: | Conversion d'un système de balayage entrelacé de vidéo décodé en un système de balayage progressif, tenant compte du système de balayage avant codage. | [2011/21] |
Former [1999/21] | Umwandlung eines Abtastsystems in ein Abtastsystem mit progressiver Abtastung, ungeachtet des Abtastsystems vor der Kodierung | ||
Former [1999/21] | Scanning system convertion into progressive scanning system regardless of scanning system before coding | ||
Former [1999/21] | Conversion du système de balayage en un système de balayage progressif indépendamment du système de balayage avant codage | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2004 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0743788 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [A] 1-3,10,11,16,17 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 13 * * column 3, line 11 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]US5444491 (LIM JAE S [US]) [A] 1,10,16 * column 1, line 59 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 * | Examination | JPH09182032 | EP0757482 | EP0710018 | US5365273 |