blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0917935

EP0917935 - Method for the machining of workpieces of wood, plastic or the like in a moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/21]Method for the machining of workpieces of wood, plastic or the like in a moulding machine and a moulding machine for carrying out the method
[2008/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2010
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Michael Weinig Aktiengesellschaft
Weinigstrasse 2/4
D-97941 Tauberbischofsheim / DE
[2009/38]
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
Michael Weinig Aktiengesellschaft
Weinigstrasse 2/4
D-97941 Tauberbischofsheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Englert, Heinrich
Sachsenstrasse 2
97922 Lauda-Königshofen / DE
[1999/21]
Representative(s)Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina
Patentanwälte
Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl
Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina
Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98121093.306.11.1998
[1999/21]
Priority number, dateDE199715103319.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19751033
[1999/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0917935
Date:26.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0917935
Date:17.11.2004
[2004/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0917935
Date:16.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2004
ClassificationIPC:B27F1/02, B27F1/06, B27M1/08, B27C1/08
[2008/30]
CPC:
B23Q7/14 (EP); B23Q7/055 (EP); B27C1/08 (EP);
B27F1/04 (EP); B27F1/06 (EP); B27G19/10 (EP);
B27M1/08 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2004/47]B27F1/02, B27F1/06, B27M1/08
Former IPC [1999/21]B27F1/06, B27M1/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/31]
Former [1999/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vefahren zum Bearbeiten von Werkstücken aus Holz, Kunststoff und dergleichen auf einer Kehlmaschine[2008/30]
English:Method for the machining of workpieces of wood, plastic or the like in a moulding machine[2008/30]
French:Procédé d'usinage de pièces en bois, plastique ou similaires dans une moulurière[2008/30]
Former [1999/21]Vefahren zum Bearbeiten von Werkstücken aus Holz, Kunststoff und dergleichen auf einer Kehlmaschine sowie Kehlmaschine zur Durchführung eines solchen Verfahrens
Former [1999/21]Method for the machining of workpieces of wood, plastic or the like in a moulding machine and a moulding machine for carrying out the method
Former [1999/21]Procédé d'usinage de pièces en bois, plastique ou similaires dans une moulurière et moulurière pour la mise en oeuvre d'une telle méthode
Examination procedure21.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/25]
29.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2008Fee for grant paid
12.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
24.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR30.11.2009
GB16.12.2009
[2014/38]
Former [2011/32]FR30.11.2009
GB16.12.2009
Former [2011/25]IT06.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
GB16.12.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US2645256  (SMITH ORSON P) [A] 3* column 4, line 59 - line 63; figure - *;
 [X]DE941451  (KURT FRIEBE) [X] 1,2,6 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * figure -; claim 2 *;
 [A]DE1128630  (DIETRICH SEEWALD) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [XY]AT263335B  (HRACHOWINA HOLZBAU) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 3;
 [XY]DE2921108  (OKOMA MASCHF GMBH) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8;
 [X]GB2125728  (BOARDMAN SUSAN MARY) [X] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 19 - line 42; figure - *;
 [X]DE3303162  (GUBISCH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3307809  (WEINIG MICHAEL KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0218001  (WEINIG MICHAEL GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0254798  (GUBISCH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 9-12 * page 7, line 15 - line 19; figure - * [Y] 7,8,13;
 [Y]EP0410173  (GUBISCH MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 13 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0455962  (BERGER ALFRED ULLRICH [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 36 - line 54; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.