EP0919372 - Printing unit for a rotary printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss International Americas, Inc. 121 Broadway Street Dover, NH 03820 / US | [2004/46] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
John, Sheridan Richard 3 Hall Road Barrington, NH 03825 / US | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/02] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/46] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98121185.7 | 13.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | US19970979108 | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 979108 | [1999/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0919372 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0919372 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0919372 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/004, B41F7/12, B41F13/008 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
B41F13/008 (EP,US);
B41F7/12 (EP,US);
B41P2213/208 (EP,US);
B41P2213/734 (EP,US);
B41P2227/11 (EP,US);
B41P2227/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/22] | B41F13/004 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckwerk für eine Rotationsdruckmaschine | [1999/22] | English: | Printing unit for a rotary printing machine | [1999/22] | French: | Groupe imprimant pour une rotative | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 22.06.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE KBA Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft, -Lizenzen - Patente- Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2005/46] | 18.11.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.02.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.08.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.06.2008 | Appeal received No. T1202/08 | 21.08.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.02.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 10.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 12.01.2005 | IE | 12.01.2005 | IT | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | SE | 12.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | AT | 13.11.2005 | CY | 13.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/12] | IE | 12.01.2005 | |
IT | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
AT | 13.11.2005 | ||
CY | 13.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/23] | IE | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
AT | 13.11.2005 | ||
CY | 13.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | IE | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
CY | 13.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | IE | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | IE | 12.01.2005 | |
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | IE | 12.01.2005 | |
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | SE | 12.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0644048 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH])[DA] 1,20; | [A]DE19603663 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1,20 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 29 - column 7, line 6 *; | [E]WO9906211 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-20 * column W * | Opposition | DE4408025 |