EP0999277 - Method for expression of recombinant proteins through the use of the effects of stress and stress-response mechanisms in the presence of compatible solutes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barth, Stefan, Dr. rer. nat. c/o Klinik I für innere Medizin der Universität zu Köln Joseph-Stelzmann-Strasse 9 50931 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Barth, Stefan, Dr. rer. nat. c/o Klinik I für innere Medizin der Universität zu Köln, Joseph-Stelzmann-Strasse 9 50931 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barth, Stefan, Dr.Dr. Zülpicher Wall 40 50674 Köln / DE | 02 /
Engert, Andreas, Dr. Spichernstrasse 18 50672 Köln / DE | 03 /
Louis, Petra Thusneldastrasse 24 53117 Bonn / DE | 04 /
Galinski, Erwin A., Prof.Dr. Sperberweg 27 48308 Senden / DE | 05 /
Huhn, Michael, Dr. Opladener Strasse 106a 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2000/41] |
Former [2000/19] | 01 /
Barth, Stefan, Dr.Dr. Zülpicher Wall 40 50674 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
Engert, Andreas, Dr. Spichernstrasse 18 50672 Köln / DE | |||
03 /
Louis, Petra Thusneldastrasse 24 53117 Bonn / DE | |||
04 /
Galinski, Erwin, Prof.Dr. Melbweg 36a 53127 Bonn / DE | |||
05 /
Huhn, Michael, Dr. Opladener Strasse 106a 51375 Leverkusen / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2000/19] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121243.4 | 07.11.1998 | [2000/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999277 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/70, C12N1/38, C12N15/62, C12P21/02 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/52 (EP);
C07K16/2866 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP);
C12N1/38 (EP);
C12N15/625 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/03] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Expression rekombinanter Proteine unter Ausnutzung der Wirkung von Stress und Stressantwortmechanismen in Gegenwart kompatibler Solute | [2000/19] | English: | Method for expression of recombinant proteins through the use of the effects of stress and stress-response mechanisms in the presence of compatible solutes | [2000/19] | French: | Procédé pour l'expression de protéines recombinantes par exploitation des effets de stress et des mécanismes de réponse au stress en présence de solutés compatibles | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/36] | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.12.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.12.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.12.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19610972 (GALINSKI ERWIN A DR ;LOUIS PETRA (DE)) [A] 4,6,7 * abstract *; | [XY] - HUHN, M. ET AL., "Highly efficient periplasmic expression of functional Pseudomonas Exotoxin-based immunotoxins.", ANNALS OF HEMATOLOGY, (19981025), vol. 77, no. Suppl. II, pages S84 - Abstr.331, XP002099619 [X] 1-11,15,16 * the whole document * [Y] 12-14 | [YA] - HERBST B ET AL, "pOSEX: vectors for osmotically controlled and finely tuned gene expression in Escherichia coli", GENE, (19941230), vol. 151, no. 1, page 137-142, XP004042625 [Y] 12 * abstract * * page 138, column L, paragraph 1 * [A] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90644-0 | [YA] - MATTHEY, B. ET AL., "pMB1.1, a new pET-based vector for high efficiency expression of ETA' fusion toxins.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (199706), vol. 33, no. Suppl.5, page 129, XP002099620 [Y] 13 * the whole document * [A] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(96)00342-5 | [Y] - SCHEIN C ET AL, "Formation of soluble recombinant proteins in Escherichia coli is favored by lower growth temperature", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (198803), vol. 6, pages 291 - 294, XP002092249 [Y] 14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0388-291 | [A] - BLACKWELL, J.R. ET AL., "A novel strategy for production of a highly expressed recombinant protein in an active form", FEBS LETTERS, (199112), vol. 295, no. 1-3, pages 10 - 12, XP002099621 [A] * abstract * * page 11, column R, line 1 - line 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)81372-F | [A] - FRINGS E ET AL, "Production of hydroxyectoine: high cell-density cultivation and osmotic downshock of Marinococcus strain M52", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (19951121), vol. 43, no. 1, page 53-61, XP004036886 [A] 1-5 * das ganze Dokument, ins besondere Seite 54, linke Spalte, Absatz 3, Seite 56-57, unter "Results" - absatz 1, und der erste Absatz der Diskussion (Seite 59-60) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(95)00119-2 | [A] - DA COSTA, M.S. ET AL., "An overview of the role and diversity of compatible solutes in bacteria and archaea.", ADVANCES IN BIOCHEMICAL ENGENEERING/BIOTECHNOLOGY, (19980101), vol. 61, XP002099622 [A] 1-3 * paragraph [03.2]; figures 8A,9A * | [A] - MAY, G. ET AL., "Binding protein dependent transport of glycine betaine and its osmotic regulation in Escherichia coli K12", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, (198611), vol. 205, no. 2, pages 225 - 233, XP002099623 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00430432 | [A] - SCHEIN C H, "PRODUCTION OF SOLUBLE RECOMBINANT PROTEINS IN BACTERIA", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (19891101), vol. 7, no. 11, pages 1141 - 1149, XP000068927 [A] * abstract * * page 1144, column R, paragraph 5 * * page 1146, column L, line 2 * | [T] - MATTHEY, B. ET AL., "A new series of pET-derived vectors for high efficiency expression of Pseudomonas exotoxin-based fusion proteins", GENE, (1999), vol. 229, pages 145 - 53, XP002099624 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(99)00038-4 |