EP0917200 - Semiconductor device, electrostatic discharge protection device, and dielectric breakdown preventing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Makoto NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121454.7 | 11.11.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | JP19970325156 | 12.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32515697 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917200 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H01L27/0266 (EP,US);
H01L27/0288 (EP,US);
H01L27/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/04] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement, Entladungsschutzvorrichtung, und Verfahren zur Verhinderung eines dielektrischen Durchbruchs | [1999/20] | English: | Semiconductor device, electrostatic discharge protection device, and dielectric breakdown preventing method | [1999/20] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur, dispositif de protection contre des décharges électrostatiques, et méthode de prévention du claquage diélectrique | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2281813 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - line 24 * * page 5, line 19 - line 27 *; | [X]EP0656659 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * abstract * * column 6, line 40 - column 8, line 54 *; | [X]US5637902 (JIANG CHUN [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPH02238668 ; | [A]EP0292327 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901207), vol. 014, no. 553, Database accession no. (E - 1010), & JP02238668 A 19900920 (FUJITSU LTD) [AD] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * |