EP0917827 - Method for the preparation of bacon and specific use of the bacon prepared by this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EG Fleischwarenfabrik Dieter Hein GmbH & Co. KG Hansastrasse 8-10 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [1999/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hein, Dieter Eichenkamp 52 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Köhler, Reimund Patentanwalt Uhlandallee 74 15732 Eichwalde / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Köhler, Reimund Patentanwalt, Uhlandallee 74 15732 Eichwalde / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121644.3 | 12.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | DE1997154331 | 23.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19754331 | [1999/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917827 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917827 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/314, A23L1/317, A23L1/318 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
A23B4/044 (EP);
A23L13/43 (EP);
A23L13/77 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Speck und die besondere Anwendung des nach diesem Verfahren hergestellten Specks | [1999/21] | English: | Method for the preparation of bacon and specific use of the bacon prepared by this method | [1999/21] | French: | Procédé de préparation de lard et l'utilisation spécifique du lard obtenu selon ce procédé | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 16.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DE, LU, MC | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 26.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2300297 (GEWUERZMUELLER KARL MUELLER &); | [DA]DE3229567 (ZWIENER FRANZ, et al); |