EP1002521 - Use of sage extracts obtained by extraction with carbon dioxide as deodorants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/21] | Use of sage extracts as deodorants | ||
[2001/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEILMITTELBETRIEB ISERNHAGEN GMBH Kirschblütenweg 7 61348 Bad Homburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Heilmittelbetrieb Isernhagen GmbH Kirschblütenweg 7 61348 Bad Homburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinhard, Max Kirschblütenweg 7 61348 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
Geissler, Jürgen Wurkwitzer Strasse 34 01187 Dresden / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Horst Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Schmidt, Horst, Dr. H. Schmidt & B. Müller, Postfach 44 01 20 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121938.9 | 19.11.1998 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002521 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002521 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/32, A61K7/48 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61K8/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/874 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung von Salbeiextrakten erhalten durch Extraktion mit Kohlendioxid als Deodorantien | [2001/48] | English: | Use of sage extracts obtained by extraction with carbon dioxide as deodorants | [2001/48] | French: | Utilisation d'extraits de sauge obtenus par extraction au dioxyde de carbone comme deodorants | [2001/48] |
Former [2000/21] | Verwendung von Salbeiextrakten als Deodorantien | ||
Former [2000/21] | Use of sage extracts as deodorants | ||
Former [2000/21] | Utilisation d'extraits de sauge comme deodorants | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 07.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]RO88082 ; | [X]JPH01145063 ; | [XY]FR2345143 (GREVE RAINER [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * claims 1,7-13 * [Y] 1-5; | [X]LU83173 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 3, line 20 - line 22; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2535203 (JEAN DANIEL [FR]) [X] 1,3,4 * claims 1-6 *; | [YD]WO9417814 (ISERNHAGEN HEILMITTELBETR GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19541735 (ROLLER IRIS [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * example 8 *; | [A]FR2753374 (RIVADIS LAB [FR]) [A] 1,3,4 * example 3 *; | [X] - "Verwendung von Herbasol-Extrakten in der Kosmetik", SEIFE-ÖLE-FETTE-WACHSE, augsburg, DE, (198112), vol. 107, no. 20, pages 623 - 625, XP002096993 [X] 1,3,4 * Seite 624, Absatz 12: Deodorantien und Antiperspirantien * | [X] - STN, Karlsruhe, DE, Database Chemical, XP002096994 [X] 1,3,4 * Abstract, Band 121, AN=91368 * Zusammenfassung * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 16, Database accession no. 86-104817, XP002096995 & RO88082 A 00000000 (NIVEA INTR PROD COS) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 29, Database accession no. 89-209302, XP002096996 & JPH01145063 A 00000000 (LION CORP) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * |