EP0924515 - Solid electrolyte with inner reference chamber and electrodes on inner and outer surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katafuchi, Tooru c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Kiyomi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Namitsugu c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Sano, Hiromi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121974.4 | 19.11.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | JP19970337869 | 20.11.1997 Original published format: JP 33786997 | JP19980251054 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25105498 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924515 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924515 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924515 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
G01N27/4075 (EP,US);
G01N27/407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/26] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Festelektrolyt mit innerer Referenzkammer und Elektroden auf Innen- und Aussenflächen | [1999/25] | English: | Solid electrolyte with inner reference chamber and electrodes on inner and outer surfaces | [1999/25] | French: | Electrolyte solide avec chambre interne de réference et des électrodes sur les surfaces interieur et exterieur | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01129596.1 / EP1195602 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19702096 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 2,6 * [Y] 3-5; | [X]US4155827 (LINDER ERNST [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 17 - line 55; figure 5 *; | [XA]JPH04157358 ; | [X]JPH05126789 ; | [X]DE2838122 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,2 * page 11, line 1 - line 4 * * page 7, paragraph L; figures 2,3 *; | [PX]EP0811840 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * figure 3 *; | [YXA]DE3726479 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3-5 * figure 1 * [X] 6,9,11-13 [A] 1,2; | [AX]US4127463 (ROHR FRANZ-JOSEF, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 17 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,3 * [X] 6,9,11-13; | [DAX]DE2206216 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 10, line 10 - line 11 * * page 14, line 8 - line 26; figures 3,4; claim 3 * [X] 6,9-13; | [X]JPS57166556 ; | [X]EP0125069 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 6-9,11,14 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [PX]EP0809101 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [PX] 6-14 * page 5, line 16 - line 29; figure 8 * * page 11, line 29 - line 46; figures 22,23 *; | [E]EP0896219 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [E] 6,9,11-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - line 53 * * column 4, line 20 - line 37 * * column 6, line 17; figures 2,5-10; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19532158 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 6-8 * figure 8 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920917), vol. 016, no. 448, Database accession no. (P - 1423), & JP04157358 A 19920529 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 7,8 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 25, Database accession no. 1992-231513 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 017, no. 495, Database accession no. (P - 1608), & JP05126789 A 19930521 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830111), vol. 007, no. 006, Database accession no. (P - 167), & JP57166556 A 19821014 (NIPPON DENSO KK) [X] 6,9,11-13 * abstract * |