EP0921430 - Active matrix liquid-crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | [2006/15] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishida, Shinichi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsuyama, Hiroaki NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122076.7 | 20.11.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | JP19970320121 | 20.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32012197 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921430 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921430 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1343 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
G02F1/134363 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/136227 (KR);
G02F1/1368 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/08] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aktivmatrix-Flüssigkristallanzeige | [1999/23] | English: | Active matrix liquid-crystal display | [1999/23] | French: | Affichage à cristaux liquides à matrice active | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 05.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.04.2006 | [2009/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06202073 ; | [A]JPH09197420 ; | [A]EP0805374 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 5; figures 1A-D * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941024), vol. 018, no. 557, Database accession no. (P - 1817), & JP06202073 A 19940722 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 097, no. 011, & JP09197420 A 19970731 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |