EP0943698 - Method and device for the transport of cylindrical substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leybold Systems GmbH Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 63450 Hanau / DE | [1999/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumecker, Tomas Andersenstrasse 30 63486 Bruchköbel / DE | 02 /
Grimm, Helmut Dr. Stadtweg 27 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Henrich, Jürgen Am Georgenwald 5 63694 Limeshain / DE | 04 /
Michael, Klaus Dr. Schöne Aussicht 16a 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 05 /
Rödling, Gert Schillerstrasse 17 63179 Obertshausen / DE | 06 /
Ulrich, Jürgen Ringstrasse 17 61137 Schöneck / DE | [1999/38] | Application number, filing date | 98122276.3 | 24.11.1998 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | DE1998107032 | 19.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19807032 | [1999/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0943698 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/56, C23C14/10 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
C23C14/56 (EP,US);
C23C14/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Transportieren von zylindrischen Substraten | [1999/38] | English: | Method and device for the transport of cylindrical substrates | [1999/38] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le transport de substrats cylindriques | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |