EP0919718 - Refrigerant compressor with cooling fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Kazuya KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2 chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Okada, Masahiko KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2 chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kaneshige, Yuji KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2 chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122342.3 | 25.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | JP19970326431 | 27.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32643197 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919718 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919718 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/08, F04B39/06 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
F04B27/0895 (EP,US);
F04B39/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2000/44] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kältemittelkompressor mit Kühlventilator | [1999/22] | English: | Refrigerant compressor with cooling fan | [1999/22] | French: | Compresseur de réfrigérant avec ventilateur | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 24.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5642798 (MUIRHEAD HUGH JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 6, line 57; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5363912 (WOLCOTT JOHN H [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 5, line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0736690 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09177946 ; | [A]EP0740077 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09177946 A 19970711 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |