blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0922760

EP0922760 - Transgenic animal not expressing endogenous osteoclastogenesis inhibitory factor (OCIF) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.07.2002  [2002/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snow Brand Milk Products Co., Ltd.
1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi
Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS, CO., LTD.
1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku
Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizuno, Atsuko
3506-14, Hishi-machi 2-chome
Kiryu-shi, Gunma / JP
02 / Murakami, Akihiko
24-8, Ekihigashi-machi, Mibu-machi
Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi / JP
03 / Fujise, Nobuaki
Ishibashi Heights 201, 223-2, Ishibashi
Ishibashi-machi, Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi / JP
04 / Sato, Yasushi
1-11-30, Wakamatsubara
Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi / JP
05 / Kanno, Takeshi
Grandhill Miki F-201, 1-9-26, Hyogozuka
Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi / JP
06 / Tsuda, Eisuke, Daia-paresu
Jichiidai 5-bankan 407, 13-1, Gion 2-chome
Minamikawachi-machi, Kawachi-gun Tochigi / JP
07 / Morinaga, Tomonori
11-12, Saiwaicho 3-chome, Mibu-machi
Shimatsuga-gun, Tochigi / JP
08 / Higashio, Kanji
1769-10, Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al
Boeters & Lieck
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al
Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date98122542.801.12.1998
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateJP1997033224002.12.1997         Original published format: JP 33224097
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0922760
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0922760
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/00, A01K67/027, C07K14/52, A61K49/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
C12N15/8509 (EP); A01K67/0276 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/52 (EP); A01K2217/075 (EP); A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/03 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1999/24]C12N15/00, A01K67/027, A61K49/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/38]
Former [1999/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Transgenes Tier, welches keinen endogenen Osteoklastenenstehungshemmfaktor (OCIF) exprimiert[1999/24]
English:Transgenic animal not expressing endogenous osteoclastogenesis inhibitory factor (OCIF)[1999/24]
French:Animal transgénique n' exprimant pas de facteur inhibant l'ostéoclastogenèse (OCIF) endogène[1999/24]
Examination procedure26.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
28.05.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9319166  (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9626217  (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5;
 [Y]WO9723614  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * figures 5-10,27,28 *;
 [PY]EP0816380  (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 1-5 * SeqIdNo.6 *;
 [E]WO9919468  (AMGEN INC [US]) [E] 1-5* the whole document *;
 [Y]  - BILEZIKIAN J ET AL (EDITORS), Principles of Bone Biology - Chapter 86: "Gene Targeting" by Karaplis A.C., 1996, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., XP002090123 [Y] 1-5 * page 1189 - page 1201 *
 [PX]  - MIZUNO A ET AL, "Severe osteoporosis in mice lacking osteoclastogenesis inhibitory factor/osteoprotegerin", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,US,ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, (19980629), vol. 247, no. 3, page 610-615, XP002090119 [PX] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.8697
 [PX]  - BUCAY N ET AL, "Osteoprotegerin-deficient mice develop early onset osteoporosis and arterial calcification", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (19980501), vol. 12, no. 9, pages 1260 - 1268, XP002090118 [PX] 1-5 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.