EP0924337 - Press roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beyerknecht, Roman Eckelbachergasse 18 3100 St. Pölten / AT | 02 /
Ribar, Heinz Kaiserbrunnstrasse 33 3021 Pressbaum / AT | 03 /
Bangert, Herwig, Dr. Rudolf Waisenhorngasse 45 1240 Wien / AT | 04 /
Bergauer, Anton, Dr. Leopold Kuntschakgasse 7/1 2232 Deutsch Wagram / AT | 05 /
Eisenmenger-Sittner, Christoph, Dr. Schulgasse 15a 2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Kurz, Günther, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Kurz, Günther, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98122860.4 | 02.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | DE1997156226 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756226 | [1999/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924337 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924337 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924337 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/08 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
D21F3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, SE [2001/01] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Presswalze | [1999/25] | English: | Press roll | [1999/25] | French: | Rouleau de presse | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2005
24.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Metso Paper, Inc. Rautpohjankatu P.O. Box 587 40101 Jyväskylä / FI Opponent's representative TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2005
24.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Metso Paper, Inc. Rautpohjankatu P.O. Box 587 40101 Jyväskylä / FI Opponent's representative TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2005
24.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE METSO PAPER, INC. Rautpohjankatu P.O. Box 587 40101 Jyväskylä / FI Opponent's representative Chivarov, Georgui, Dr. Dipl.Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | 28.04.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.11.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.10.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.10.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/12] | Appeal following opposition | 21.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T1937/06 | 16.02.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.10.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 15.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.12.2006 | [2008/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0207921 (YAMAUCHI RUBBER IND CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * column A; figure - * * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 11 *; | [A]US4767501 (LAAPOTTI JORMA [FI]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 63; figures 1-11 ** column 8, line 51 - line 61 *; | [DA]WO9113204 (TAMPELLA PAPERTECH OY [FI]) [DA] 1 * column A; figure - * |