Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0923917
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.10.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
10.10.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
22.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.04.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.08.2002 |
First examination report |
|
23.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.01.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
30.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.11.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
26.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
10.03.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] |
07.05.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] |