EP0924468 - Electric glow plug for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Beru AG Postfach 229 71602 Ludwigsburg / DE | [1999/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jakobi, Hansjörg Mercatorweg 3 70439 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Klak, Roland Talwiesenweg 4 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 03 /
Thiemann, Karl-Heinz Eichendorffweg 1 71404 Korb / DE | 04 /
Delesky, Hans Metterzimmerer Strasse 173 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | [1999/25] | Application number, filing date | 98123342.2 | 08.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | DE1997156988 | 20.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756988 | [1999/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924468 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924468 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924468 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F23Q7/00 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
F23Q7/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/22] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisch beheizbare Glühkerze oder Glühstab für Verbrennungsmotoren | [1999/25] | English: | Electric glow plug for internal combustion engines | [1999/25] | French: | Bougie électrique à incandescence pour moteur à combustion interne | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2027805 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * page 2, line 57 - line 88; figure - *; | [A]US4437440 (SUZUKI SHIN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - line 32; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0450185 |