EP0903945 - Interframe coding system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Tokumichi Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Tsushin System Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Yoshiaki Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Tsushin System Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Toshiaki Mitsubishi Denki K. K. Tsushin System Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ofuna 5-chome Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98123716.7 | 23.12.1993 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | JP19920346552 | 25.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34655292 | JP19930036371 | 25.02.1993 Original published format: JP 3637193 | JP19930207842 | 23.08.1993 Original published format: JP 20784293 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903945 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903945 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903945 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/30, H04N7/32, H04N7/26, H04N7/36, H04N7/50, G06T9/00 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H04N19/86 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/112 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/503 (EP,US);
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,US);
H04N19/82 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/12] | H04N7/30, H04N7/36, H04N7/50, G06T9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/12] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Zwischenbildkodierung | [1999/12] | English: | Interframe coding system and method | [1999/12] | French: | Système et méthode de codage intertrame | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93120766.6 / EP0603878 | Divisional application(s) | EP01107231.1 / EP1126723 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8810544 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 2 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 5 *; | [A]EP0444918 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 17, line 34 - column 18, line 41 *; | [A]EP0370315 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 23 - column 9, line 5 * | [XY] - OHTSUKA ET AL., "Development of 135 Mbit/s HDTV codec", SIGNAL PROCESSING IMAGE COMMUNICATION., AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 4, no. 4/5, pages 379 - 387, XP000293755 [X] 1,4,6 * page 380, column 2, line 1 - line 23; table 1 * * page 382, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 383, column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(92)90010-D | [X] - HELGESON ET AL., "IMPACT OF RECENT COMPRESSION/DECOMPRESSION TECHNOLOGIES IN VIDEO DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS", 11TH DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, SEATTLE, (19921005), pages 568 - 572, XP000366739 [X] 1,3 * page 571, column 1 - column 2; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DASC.1992.282099 |