EP0964586 - Housing for a small telecommunication equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeTeWe Systems GmbH Zeughofstrasse 1 10997 Berlin / DE | [2005/31] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states DeTeWe - Deutsche Telephonwerke Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Zeughofstrasse 1 10997 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krämer, Katharina Reuterstrasse 49 12047 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Krispin, Harro Beyschlagstrasse 31d 13503 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Pütz, Peter Alt-Tempelhof 23 12103 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Schulz, Jürgen Watzmannweg 11A 12107 Berlin / DE | [1999/50] | Application number, filing date | 98123781.1 | 15.12.1998 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | DE1998210260U | 08.06.1998 Original published format: DE 29810260 U | [1999/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0964586 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0964586 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/14, H01Q1/14, H05K7/14 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
H04Q1/10 (EP);
H04Q1/03 (EP);
H04Q1/035 (EP);
H05K7/1427 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/50] | H04Q1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gehäuse für eine kleine Telekommunikationsanlage | [1999/50] | English: | Housing for a small telecommunication equipment | [1999/50] | French: | Boîtier pour un petit appareil de télécommunication | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 29.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5515240 (RODEFFER CHARLES E ET AL) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]DE4207948 (DEUTSCHE TELEPHONWERK KABEL) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, paragraph 49 - column 2, paragraph 40 *; | [AD]DE3737058 (DEUTSCHE TELEPHONWERKE UND KABELINDUSTRIE AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE7315519U (SIEMENS) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |