EP0924564 - Silver halide light sensitive color photographic material and process for preparing color proof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tosaka, Yasuo c/o Konica Corporation 28 Horinouchi Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nonaka, Yoshiyuki c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hochioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98123936.1 | 16.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | JP19970364073 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36407397 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0924564 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924564 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/95, G03C7/30, G03F3/10 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
G03F3/107 (EP,US);
G03C1/95 (EP,US);
G03C7/3029 (EP,US);
G03C7/382 (EP,US);
Y10S430/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2001/36] |
Former [2000/09] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliches, farbphotographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Farbprobedrucks | [1999/25] | English: | Silver halide light sensitive color photographic material and process for preparing color proof | [1999/25] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière et procédé de préparation d'épreuve en couleurs | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5434033 (KAWAI KIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,7 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 61 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 47 * * column 10, line 9 - line 18 * * column 12, line 21 - column 13, line 23 * * column 17, line 40 - line 57 * * table 3 * * column 38, line 45 - line 65 *; | [X]US5364748 (YONEYAMA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,3,7 * column 1, line 28 - column 32, line 68 * * column 36, line 3 - line 43 * * column 37, line 35 - column 38, line 21 * * column 40, line 51 - column 42, line 41 * * column 45, line 55 - line 64 * * column 52, line 48 - column 53, line 31 * * examples 1,2; tables A,B *; | [X]EP0675404 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 3, line 4 - line 49 * * page 7, line 18 - line 54 * * page 10, line 46 - page 14, line 54 * * page 17, line 34 - line 47 * * page 29, line 37 - page 30, line 35 * * page 34; table 1 * * page 39; table 2 *; | [X]US5252424 (SATO ERIKA M [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 26 - line 64 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 54 * * column 11, line 7 - line 33 *; | [X]JPH08314081 ; | [A]EP0653673 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 18, line 1 - page 20, line 13 * * page 26, line 6 - line 44 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0585062 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-3,6 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 36 * * page 16, line 15 - line 28 * * page 17, line 15 - line 37 * * page 27, line 50 - page 29, line 10 * * page 30, line 33 - line 53 * * page 36; table 1 * * page 42, line 26 - line 37 *; | [A]EP0723192 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-3,6 * page 3, line 21 - line 45 * * page 4, line 53 - line 58 * * page 6, line 14 - line 21 * * page 7, line 49 - page 8, line 9 * * page 13, line 6 - line 58 * * page 17, line 8 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0305599 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1 * page 3, column 4, line 3 - page 4, column 5, line 50 * * claims 1,9 *; | [A]JPS6244735 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 07, Database accession no. 97-068976, XP002096572 & JPH08314081 A 19961129 (KONICA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870730), vol. 011, no. 233, Database accession no. (P - 600), & JP62044735 A 19870226 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |