EP1010910 - Method of forming raceways for axial rolling bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwarzbich, Jörg Wertherstrasse 15 33615 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Schwarzbich, Jörg Werther Strasse 15 D-33615 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124001.3 | 17.12.1998 | [2000/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010910 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/64 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
F16C33/64 (EP);
F16C19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/09] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Laufringen für Axial-Wälzlager | [2000/25] | English: | Method of forming raceways for axial rolling bearings | [2000/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de bagues de roulement pour paliers axials | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/40] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.01.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.01.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE556916 (FIEDRICH IM SCHLAA IN ISERLOHN) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE924262 (G. WEHR) [A] 1 * the whole document * |