blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0925727

EP0925727 - An emulsion concentrate for soft drinks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V.
Huizerstraatweg 28
1411 GP Naarden / NL
[1999/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Sloot, Engelbertus Albertus
Simon Stevinweg 92
1222 ST Hilversum / NL
02 / Burger, Jacobus Johannes
Bakboord 7
1316 VA Almere / NL
03 / Van de Kamp, Erwin
Revalmeen 21
3844 CD Harderwijk / NL
04 / Schmedding, Diederik Johannes Maria
Koninginneweg 76
1241 CW Kortenhoef / NL
[1999/26]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2000/02]Kraag, F., Ir., et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [1999/26]Humphries, Martyn, et al
ICI Group Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 90
Wilton, Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB
Application number, filing date98124018.717.12.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateEP1997020410924.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97204109
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0925727
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0925727
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A23L2/385, A23L2/56, A23L2/62
[1999/26]
CPC:
A23L2/56 (EP); A23L2/385 (EP); A23L2/62 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Emulsionkonzentrat für nicht alkoholische Getränke[1999/26]
English:An emulsion concentrate for soft drinks[1999/26]
French:Concentré d'émulsion pour boissons non alcoolisées[1999/26]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
29.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
06.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200104   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.2002
31.12.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0526837  (KURIHARA YOSHIE ;ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK (JP)) [A] 1,12 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 58; example 1; claims 1,5 *;
 [A]SU1533633  ;
 [A]US3660105  (KESTERSON JAMES W ET AL) [A] 1,12,13 * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 10; claims 1-3,5 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 28, Database accession no. 1990-216085, XP002123406 & SU1533633 A 19900107 (WINE GROWING PROD RES) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.