EP0945614 - Piston pump for a vehicle brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alaze, Norbert Lindenweg 6 71706 Markgröningen / DE | [1999/39] | Application number, filing date | 98124100.3 | 18.12.1998 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | DE1998113302 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813302 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945614 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945614 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945614 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04, F04B5/02, B60T8/40 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
F04B5/02 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
B60T8/4068 (EP,US);
F04B1/0426 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/39] | F04B1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/11] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kolbenpumpe bzw. Bremsanlage mit Kolbenpumpe | [1999/39] | English: | Piston pump for a vehicle brake system | [1999/39] | French: | Pompe à piston pour un système de freinage de véhicule | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]US4875741 (OZAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [DX] 1,7,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 6, line 29; figures 1-3 * [A] 4; | [A]US4983100 (BUDECKER LUDWIG [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 59; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE4102364 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 54 * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 16; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US5573386 (SCHMITT EDGAR [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,7,8 * abstract ** figure - *; | [XA]DE19738524 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * * column 6, line 18 - column 8, line 64; figures 1,2 * [A] 4 | by applicant | US4875741 |