blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0926722

EP0926722 - Method for detecting under-etched vias [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2003/38]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schnabel, Rainer Florian
5 Maxwell Place
Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US
02 / Ning, Xian J.
3872 Marcy Street
Mohegan Lake, NY 10547 / US
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [1999/26]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date98124158.119.12.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateUS1997099746023.12.1997         Original published format: US 997460
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0926722
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0926722
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/66
[1999/26]
CPC:
B82Y15/00 (EP,US); H01L22/00 (KR); G01N1/32 (EP,US);
G01N21/9501 (EP,US); G01N21/95692 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/43]
Former [2000/37]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Feststellung von durch Unterätzen erzeugten Kontaktlöchern[1999/26]
English:Method for detecting under-etched vias[1999/26]
French:Méthode de détection d'ouvertures de contact sous-gravées[1999/26]
Examination procedure16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
23.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/37]
18.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH03148151  ;
 [XAY]US5214283  (LE TAM T [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 43 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 27 * [A] 11,21 [Y] 5,7;
 [Y]US5301012  (KING MARK R [US], et al) [Y] 5,7 * column 1, lines 29-49 * * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 8 *;
 [XA]DE19629249  (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [X] 11,12,14,16 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 12 * * column 5, lines 14-31 * [A] 21;
 [XA]  - ANONYMOUS, "Sub-Micron Contact Hole Inspection Monitor Wafer", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, Emsworth, GB, (19870410), vol. 276, no. 040, XP002121606 [X] 1-4,6,8 * the whole document * [A] 11,21
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910918), vol. 015, no. 371, Database accession no. (E - 1113), & JP03148151 A 19910624 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - "SCRATCH MEASUREMENT TECHNIQUE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19910901), vol. 34, no. 4B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 263 - 264, XP000189494 [A] 5,15,24 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.