EP0926194 - Chlorinated vinyl chloride resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Takeyuki 4-3-21, Okihama-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Okuhara, Toshio 13-1-101, Nishihata 1-chome Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Isshiki, Minoru 1-25-11, Hiyoshidai Otsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124293.6 | 21.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970356871 | 25.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35687197 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0926194 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926194 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/24, // (C08L27/24, 23:28, 51:04) | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C08L27/24 (EP,US);
C08L23/286 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/24, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/10] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung aus chloriertem Vinylchloridharz | [1999/26] | English: | Chlorinated vinyl chloride resin composition | [1999/26] | French: | Composition à base de résine de chlorure de vinyle surchlorée | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0510310 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1 * example 5; claim - *; | [A]US5604278 (HARTITZ JOACHIM E [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]FR2008674 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]JPH08113685 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 28, Database accession no. 96-272832, XP002098296 & JPH08113685 A 19960507 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |