EP0926299 - Water-disintegratable cleaning sheet containing alkylcellulose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Naohito, Reseach & Development Division Uni-Charm Corp., 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama Toyohama-cho, Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa / JP | 02 /
Konishi, Takayoshi, Reseach & Development Division Uni-Charm Corp., 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama Toyohama-cho, Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa / JP | 03 /
Kurata, Ryuichiro, Toyo Ink Mfg. Co., Ltd. 3-13 Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Morohashi, Nobuo, Toyo Ink Mfg. Co. Ltd. 3-13 Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Matsumoto, Masayoshi, Toyo Ink Mfg. Co. Ltd. 3-13 Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124297.7 | 21.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970360432 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36043297 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0926299 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0926299 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926299 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/26, D21H17/37, D21H17/14 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
C11D17/049 (EP,US);
A47K10/16 (KR);
D21H17/14 (EP,US);
D21H17/26 (EP,US);
D21H17/37 (EP,US);
D21H17/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL, SE [2001/05] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Im Wasser zersetzbares, Alkylcellulose enthaltendes Reinigungsblatt | [1999/26] | English: | Water-disintegratable cleaning sheet containing alkylcellulose | [1999/26] | French: | Feuille de nettoyage désintégrable dans l'eau et contenant de l'alkylcellulose | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06101191 ; | [AD]JPH09170193 ; | [A]EP0372388 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [D]JPH0724636B ; | [A]WO9411432 (NET TECH INT INC [US]) [A] * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 2 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 19, Database accession no. 1994-157139, XP002134389 & JPH06101191 A 19940412 (NICHIRIN KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09170193 A 19970630 (TOYO INK MFG CO LTD) [AD] * abstract * |