10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
18.03.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
26.03.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
19.03.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
19.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.07.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.02.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
21.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.01.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
08.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.03.2002 |
First examination report |
|
27.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
22.02.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
22.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.02.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.11.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
23.10.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.09.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
25.08.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |
20.04.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |
17.12.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
15.10.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] |