EP0936061 - Composite material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2002/04] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groitzsch, Dieter Dr. Hermann-Löns-Strasse 6A 69493 Hirschberg / DE | 02 /
Klein, Bernhard Dr. Hofwiese 9 69488 Birkenau / DE | 03 /
Löcher, Engelbert Theodor-Storm-Strasse 39 67551 Worms / DE | [1999/33] | Application number, filing date | 98124488.2 | 28.12.1998 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | DE1998106530 | 17.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19806530 | [1999/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0936061 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0936061 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, D04H13/00 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
D04H3/007 (EP,US);
B32B5/00 (KR);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D04H3/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24826 (EP,US);
Y10T442/674 (EP,US);
Y10T442/678 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/46] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbundstoff | [1999/33] | English: | Composite material | [1999/33] | French: | Matériau composite | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/40] | 31.03.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4243012 (COROVIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-10,13,17,18 * the whole document * * IDEM * [Y] 6,7,12,19,20; | [X]GB2285408 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8-11,13-18 * page 4, line 34 - page 8, line 33 * * page 14, line 13 - page 17, line 36; example -; table 1 *; | [PX]DE19647459 (MILDENBERGER & WILLING VERPACK [DE]) [PX] 1-5,8,9,11,13,14,17,18 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9634741 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1,3,5,8,9,14,15,17 * abstract * * page 16, line 9 - page 18, line 33; claims 1,2,10 *; | [Y]WO9411189 (AMOCO FABRICS [DE], et al) [Y] 6,7 * page 10, lines 14-24; figures 2-4,6 *; | [Y]EP0309073 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 19,20 * page 2, lines 4,5 * * page 9, lines 7-12 *; | [Y]US5069847 (GRINDSTAFF TEDDY H [US]) [Y] 12 * column 3, lines 28,29 - column 10, lines 17-19; claim 1 * |