blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0927798

EP0927798 - Discharge trestle for floor gypsum transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2000
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpina Plast Innovations AG
Im Steinacker 23
8302 Kloten / CH
[1999/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Otto, Karl
Nenndorfer Strasse 43
30989 Gehuden / DE
[1999/27]
Representative(s)Weiss, Peter
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Weiss, Peter
Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Former [1999/27]Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat.
Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date98124737.228.12.1998
[1999/27]
Priority number, dateDE1997222996U31.12.1997         Original published format: DE 29722996 U
[1999/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0927798
Date:07.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.1999
ClassificationIPC:E04F21/24, E04G21/04, E04G21/00
[1999/27]
CPC:
E04F21/24 (EP); E04G21/04 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/11]
Former [1999/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Auslaufbock für die Estrichförderung[1999/27]
English:Discharge trestle for floor gypsum transfer[1999/27]
French:Chevalet de décharge pour transfert de mortier d'air[1999/27]
Examination procedure08.01.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/46]
14.06.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2000/46]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.03.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.03.2000M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4023629  (KOLMEDER GEORG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 16; figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]EP0486432  (WBT WIRTSCHAFTSBERATUNGS TRUST [LI]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2281855  (JONES RONALD FREDERICK GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 17; figure 1 *
by applicantEP0486432
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.