EP0928643 - Roll stand for rolling wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grimmel, Rüdiger Hauptstrasse 69b 57250 Netphen / DE | 02 /
Keller, Karl Auf der Hütte 12 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1999/28] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98124842.0 | 30.12.1998 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | DE1998100201 | 07.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19800201 | [1999/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0928643 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0928643 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928643 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21B31/32, B21B13/00 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
B21B31/32 (EP,US);
B21B13/005 (EP,US);
B21B31/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, IT [2002/24] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Walzgerüst zum Walzen von Draht | [1999/28] | English: | Roll stand for rolling wire | [1999/28] | French: | Cage de laminoir pour le laminage de fils | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 27.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6044107 ; | [Y]JPS58100905 ; | [A]US3468151 (DIOLOT LUCIEN) [A] 1,4,7 * column 2 - column 5; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]US3559432 (RASTELLI TELESFORE) [A] 4,5* figure - *; | [X]US4413494 (GILVAR MARTIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 43; figures 2-6 *; | [Y]US4481800 (RUHL ROBERT C [US]) [Y] 1,2,7 * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP0841104 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [PA] 1,4,7 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0846504 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [PA] 1,4,7 * the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850717), vol. 009, no. 172, Database accession no. (M - 397), & JP60044107 A 19850309 (SAKAI JUKOGYO KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 4,6 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830903), vol. 007, no. 199, Database accession no. (M - 240), & JP58100905 A 19830615 (FURUKAWA DENKI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1,2,7 * abstract * |