EP0860988 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isemura, Keizo Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshihara, Kunio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ichikawa, Hiroyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Masanori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tanabe, Masatoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Nimura, Mitsuo Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Funamizu, Yoshihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Kishimoto, Hirohiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98200211.5 | 19.02.1992 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910047667 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4766791 | JP19910153938 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15393891 | JP19910153939 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15393991 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860988 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860988 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0860988 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
H04N1/40012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/35] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsgerät | [1998/35] | English: | Image processing apparatus | [1998/35] | French: | Appareil pour traitement d'image | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92301333.8 / EP0500327 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.06.2002 | IT | 19.06.2002 | DE | 20.09.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 19.06.2002 | |
DE | 20.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | DE | 20.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0199272 (WANG LABORATORIES [US]) [X] 1,6,11,14,16 * column 6, line 33 - line 49 * * column 10, line 8 - line 39 * * column 16, line 12 - line 51 * * column A; figures 1-3,6-10 * [A] 5,10,12,13,15,17-24 [Y] 2-4,7-9; | [XAY]DE3802736 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 11,14,15,26-28 * column 8, line 15 - line 51 * * column A; figures 1A,1B,10-13; claim - * [A] 5,10,13,18-20 [Y] 1-4,6-9; | [XDA]US4369461 (TAMURA YASUYUKI [JP]) [XD] 11,14,15,27 * column 1, line 48 - line 56 * * column 3, line 20 - line 25 * * column A; figure - * [A] 1-10,13,18,19,21,25,26,28; | [XAY]WO8801778 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ POLARAD INC [US]) [X] 14,16 * column A; figures 1-4,9A,9B; claims 12,22-25 * [A] 5,10,11,13,15,18-21,23-25,28 [Y] 1-4,6-9; | [XA]WO8903108 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 14 * column A; figure 1; claim - * [A] 1-11,13,16,21,23,26,28; | [XAY]JPH01267691 ; | [YA]WO8703708 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-9 * page 10, line 19 - page 12, line 6 * * abstract * [A] 11-28 | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900119), vol. 014, no. 027, Database accession no. (P - 992), & JP01267691 A 19891025 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 11 * abstract * [A] 14,26-28 [Y] 1,6 |