EP0863151 - Canine parvovirus DNA vaccines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/37] | "Canine parvovirus dna vaccines" | ||
[2004/19] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [1998/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarpey, Ian 12 The Quadrant St. Ives, Cambridge PE17 4PE / GB | 02 /
Greenwood, Neil 4 Ansley Way St. Ives, Huntingdon Cambridge / GB | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | van Gent, Marieke, et al Intervet International B.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 31 5830 AA Boxmeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Van Gent, Marieke, et al Intervet International B.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 31 5830 AA Boxmeer / NL | ||
Former [2002/05] | Van Gent, Marieke, et al INTERVET INTERNATIONAL B.V. P.O. Box 31 5830 AA Boxmeer / NL | ||
Former [1998/37] | Ogilvie-Emanuelson, Claudia Maria, et al Patent Department Pharma N.V. Organon P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 98200426.9 | 11.02.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | EP19970300889 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: EP 97300889 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863151 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/015, // C12N15/86 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/37] | Title | German: | Hundeparvovirus DNA Impfstoffe | [1998/37] | English: | Canine parvovirus DNA vaccines | [2004/19] | French: | Vaccins en ADN contre le parvovirus canin | [1998/37] |
Former [1998/37] | "Canine parvovirus dna vaccines" | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0117767 (MOLECULAR GENETICS INC [US]); | [YA]WO8802026 (APPLIED BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [A]EP0341611 (THOMPSON BOYCE PLANT RES [US], et al); | [Y]WO9102054 (WEBSTER ARTHUR PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]EP0554414 (ERCROS SA [ES]); | [A]WO9612808 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP], et al); | [YA]WO9614088 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]); | [XP]WO9740163 (COLPAN METIN [DE], et al); | [XP]WO9803658 (MERIAL SAS [FR], et al); | [XP]WO9803660 (MERIAL SAS [FR], et al); | [XP]WO9803199 (MERIAL SAS [FR], et al); |