EP0863081 - Distribution of fresh packed products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/37] | Package, package stack, method for producing said package, method of filling said package and method of distributing products | ||
[2002/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jadimo Holding B.V. Postbus 332 2690 AH 's-Gravenzande / NL | [1998/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moerman, Jan Jacob p/a P.O. Box 332 2690 AH 's-Gravenzande / NL | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Assendelft, Jacobus H.W. Keukenhofdreef 20 2161 AZ Lisse / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Assendelft, Jacobus H.W. Maartensweer 13 2265 DH Leidschendam / NL | Application number, filing date | 98200602.5 | 02.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | NL19971005405 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: NL 1005405 | [1998/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863081 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863081 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/00 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
B65D5/0045 (EP);
B65D5/0015 (EP);
B65D5/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verteilung von verpackten, frischen Produkten | [2002/47] | English: | Distribution of fresh packed products | [2002/47] | French: | Distribution de produits frais emballés | [2002/47] |
Former [1998/37] | Verpackung, Verpackungsstapel, Verfahren zum Herstellen dieser Verpackung, Verfahren zum Füllen dieser Verpackung und Verfahren zum Verteilen der verpackten Produkte | ||
Former [1998/37] | Package, package stack, method for producing said package, method of filling said package and method of distributing products | ||
Former [1998/37] | Emballage, pile d'emballages, méthode de fabrication dudit emballage, méthode de remplissage dudit emballage et méthode de distribution des produits emballés | Examination procedure | 03.04.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DE, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 25.04.2000 | Observations by third parties | 23.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Request for further processing for: | 05.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2003 | Decision despatched | 06.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2002 | Decision despatched | 17.04.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.06.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 | 31.03.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2003 | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.12.2004 | IT | 01.12.2004 | ES | 12.03.2005 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/31] | FR | 01.12.2004 | |
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | ES | 12.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0337840 (SOFPO) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE7633554U (ZEWAWELL) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 17 - page 8, line 8; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5052615 (OTT) [X] 1-10 * column 11, line 53 - column 15, line 49; figures 6-16 *; | [X]FR2539386 (FABRE) [X] 1-8 * page 11, line 35 - page 12, line 22; figure 6 *; | [X]NL9600004 (SMURFIT LONA VERPAKKING) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0446142 (KAYSERSBERG PACKAGING) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2517641 (SOCIETE NORMANDE DE CARTON ONDULÉ); | [A]FR2446231 (BINI) | Examination | NL8300024 | other | ES280940U | ES1007238U | ES256909U | ES267260U | ES259974U | ES259782U | ES255803U | ES246170U | ES246166U | ES252457U | ES249064U | ES1013204U |