EP0876763 - Process for the preparation of extrudates for bakery application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/36] | For:BE
DE
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2003/24] | For:BE
DE
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2000/19] | For:BE
DE
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2000/15] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
AT
LU
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
For:GB
IE
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [1998/46] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
AT
LU
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adams, Wolfgang Weiler 2 88074 Meckenbueren / DE | 02 /
Funke, Andreas Wielandstrasse 8 89165 Dietenheim / DE | 03 /
Geywitz, Peter Beim Tannenhof 9 89079 Ulm / DE | 04 /
Golitz, Hartman Am Schutzenheim 4 87787 Wolfertsschwenden / DE | 05 /
Horlacher, Peter Kohlerstrasse 13 88477 Schwendi / DE | 06 /
Kniel, Barbel Offenbachstrasse 1/2 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 07 /
Rochau, Bernd Gartenstrasse 7 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 08 /
Sander, Andreas Karlsbader Strasse 19 89257 Illertissen / DE | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2001/35] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/46] | Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al UNILEVER N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 98200618.1 | 27.02.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | DE1997108165 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19708165 | EP19970202318 | 24.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97202318 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876763 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0876763 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876763 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/02, A21D10/00, A21D8/04 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
A21D2/26 (EP);
A21D8/042 (EP);
A23P10/25 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/46] | A21D8/00, A21D10/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/29] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Extrudaten für die Bäckanwendung | [1998/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of extrudates for bakery application | [1998/46] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de produits extrudés utilisés en boulangerie | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Request for further processing for: | 22.04.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.10.2003 | FR | 01.10.2003 | SE | 01.01.2004 | ES | 12.01.2004 | [2006/32] |
Former [2004/52] | BE | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | SE | 01.01.2004 | |
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0650669 (GIST BROCADES BV) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0619947 (GIST BROCADES NV) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 21 - line 56 *; | [A]US3950543 (BUFFA ALDO ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0676142 (GIST BROCADES BV); | [A]DE4106483 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) |