EP0875313 - Casting equipment for continuous or semi-continuous casting of metals, having an improved lubricating fluid supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO ASA Bygdoy Allé 2 0240 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO ASA Bygdoy Allé 2 0240 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steen, Idar Kjetil Sandbrekkgt. 22 6600 Sunndalsora / NO | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M. Bleukx Consultancy BVBA Derde Straat 7 3680 Maaseik / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Bleukx, Luc Norsk Hydro Technology B.V., Avenue Marcel Thiry 83 1200 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 98200905.2 | 23.03.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | NO19970001713 | 14.04.1997 Original published format: NO 971713 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875313 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/04, B22D11/07 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B22D11/07 (EP,US);
B22D11/0401 (EP,US);
B22D11/049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/28] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Giessvorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen oder semikontinuierlichen Giessen von Metallen, mit einer verbesserte Schmiermittelversorgung | [1998/45] | English: | Casting equipment for continuous or semi-continuous casting of metals, having an improved lubricating fluid supply | [1998/45] | French: | Dispositif pour la coulée continue ou semi-continue de métaux, comprenant une alimentation améliorée du fluide lubrifiant | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/35] | 11.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0778097 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [AP] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4598763 (WAGSTAFF FRANK E [US], et al) [AD] 1 * figures 1-16 *; | [AD]US4157728 (ITOH TADANAO [JP], et al) [AD] 1 * figures 1-14 * |