EP0869232 - Console assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JORDAHL/normteq B.V. Jan Tinbergenstraat 221 7559 SP Hengelo / NL | [2012/31] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Normteq B.V. Jan Tribergenstraat 221 7559 SP Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states H.J.J. Evers Beheer B.V. Bronforelstraat 21 7559 HH te Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states P2H development B.V. Spinelstraat 45 7554 TW Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states Hakron Verankeringstechniek B.V. Spinelstraat 45 7554 TW Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Istha, Johannis Kernkampplantsoen 4 3571 PJ Utrecht / NL | 02 /
Evers, Hermanus Johannus Josef L. Bouwmeesterstraat 170 7558 TR Hengelo / NL | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Verdijck, Gerardus, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Verdijck, Gerardus, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2010/24] | Verdijck, Gerardus, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1998/41] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98201026.6 | 01.04.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | NL19971005692 | 01.04.1997 Original published format: NL 1005692 | NL19971006105 | 21.05.1997 Original published format: NL 1006105 | [1998/41] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0869232 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869232 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0869232 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
E04B1/7046 (EP);
E04F13/0855 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | Konsoleneinrichtung | [1998/41] | English: | Console assembly | [1998/41] | French: | Dispositif de console | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE HALFEN GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Liebigstr. 14 40764 Langenfeld-Richrath / DE Opponent's representative Riedel, Peter, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE HALFEN GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Liebigstr. 14 40764 Langenfeld-Richrath / DE Opponent's representative Riedel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei, Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner, Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | 18.10.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.03.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.2005 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2005 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.12.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.02.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.02.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.03.2006 | Appeal received No. T0383/06 | 21.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.02.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 12.04.2012 | Appeal received No. T0838/12 | 25.05.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 19.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.12.2003 | IT | 10.12.2003 | DK | 10.03.2004 | GR | 10.03.2004 | SE | 10.03.2004 | ES | 21.03.2004 | LU | 01.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | PT | 10.05.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2005/23] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 10.12.2003 | |
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 10.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1125123 (JULES SCOTT ZIBELL) [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 2, line 74 - page 3, line 78 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE8524910U (DEUTSCHE KAHNEISEN GESELLSCHAFT WEST GMBH) [A] 1,6 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2577256 (ANTONELLI ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 8 - page 6, line 33 * * page 7, line 26 - line 32; figures 1-4,7 *; | [DA]EP0243612 (FRICKER SIEGFRIED) [DA] 1-3,5,7 * column 2, line 4 - column 6, line 26; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0245635 (FRICKER SIEGFRIED) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 31 - column 6, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0433656 (RISS AG [CH]) [A] 1,5-8 * column 2, line 33 - column 8, line 22; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2292398 (METSEC PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 4, line 3 - page 10, line 18; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0728883 (LUTZ ANKERSYSTEME GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,5* column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP0243612 | Opposition | US3234702 | DE7714716U | DE3618682 | US4700835 | DE3743701 | DE9004887U | GB2263918 |