EP0897697 - Spinal fixation plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap Implant Systems, Inc. 3773 Corporate Parkway Center Valley, PA 18034 / US | [2008/30] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Aesculap II, Inc. 3773 Corporate Parkway Center Valley, Pennsylvania 18034 / US | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Spinal Innovations, LLC 304 West 5th Street Carson City, Nevada 89703 / US | ||
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states Spinal Innovations 9027 Summer Grove Cove Cordova, TN 38018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richelsoph, Marc 9394 Alex Dickson Cove Memphis, TN 38133 / US | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [1999/08] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98201465.6 | 08.05.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | US19970854021 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: US 854021 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897697 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897697 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B17/80 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
A61B17/8047 (EP,US);
A61B17/7059 (EP,US);
A61B17/6491 (EP,US);
A61B17/863 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/44] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Platte für die Fixation der Wirbelsäule | [1999/08] | English: | Spinal fixation plate | [1999/08] | French: | Plaque de fixation du rachis | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 25.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Request for further processing for: | 29.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9535067 (OLERUD SVEN [SE]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-13,16,22,26 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,9,14,15,20,23-25,27; | [XA]US5520690 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,17 * column 5, line 38 - line 48 * * column 9, line 22 - line 38 * * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 6 * * figures 6,10 * [A] 3,8; | [XA]US5616142 (YUAN HANSEN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,10,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 12 - line 20 * [A] 9; | [XA]FR2726461 (HARDY JEAN MARIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-13,15,16 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 8; figures 6-9 * [A] 3,22; | [XA]WO9012547 (BETZ AUGUSTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,21,22 * page 10, line 22 - line 27 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 2 * * figures 1,4; claim 9 * [A] 10,11,23-26; | [X]DE29521456U (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 6, lines 1-9 * * page 6, line 21 - line 31 *; | [DA]US5364399 (LOWERY GARY [US], et al) [DA] 14 * figures 1,2,8,9 *; | [A]EP0599640 (CODMAN & SHURTLEFF [US]) [A] 17-19 * abstract * | by applicant | US5364399 | US5601533 | US5578034 | US4388921 | US5607428 |