EP0960572 - Nutritional composition for the treatment of pressure ulcers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Postbus 1 2700 MA Zoetermeer / NL | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verheul-Koot, Maria Anna Broeksloot 10 3474 HP Zegfeld / NL | 02 /
Kleijer, Chantal Nelleke Afrikalaan 114 2622 LR Delft / NL | 03 /
Hageman, Robert Johan Joseph Weideroom 52 2742 EV Waddinxveen / NL | 04 /
Bork, Roelof André Biggenweide 43 2727 GR Zoetermeer / NL | 05 /
Goothals, Maud Oudekamp 21 3512 KG Utrecht / NL | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98201576.0 | 12.05.1998 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0960572 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/305, A23L1/302, A23L1/304, A61K31/195 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
A61K33/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/155 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/01 (EP,US);
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K38/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/01, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/045, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/02, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/0606, A23V2250/0632 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1614, A23V2250/1582, A23V2250/16, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/1618, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1598, A23V2250/156 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/704, A23V2250/71, A23V2250/705, A23V2250/70 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/06, A23V2250/2116, A23V2250/0612, A23V2250/0644, A23V2250/304, A23V2250/156 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/70, A23V2250/06, A23V2250/2116, A23V2250/0612, A23V2250/0644, A23V2250/304, A23V2250/211, A23V2250/156 (US,EP)
(-) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ernährungszusammensetzung zur Behandlung von Dekubitalgeschwüren | [1999/48] | English: | Nutritional composition for the treatment of pressure ulcers | [1999/48] | French: | Composition nutritive pour le traitement des escarres ud décubitus | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/14] | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0367724 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-11* claim - *; | [A]EP0641562 (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [A] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A]EP0674902 (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [A] 1-11 * example 1; claim - *; | [XA]WO9602137 (UNIV WAKE FOREST [US]) [X] 1 * example 1; claim - * [A] 2-11; | [A]US5733884 (BARBUL ADRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * examples 1,2; claim - * |