EP0884064 - Balloon Catheter with impeller for perfusing blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/51] | Balloon Catheter with impeller for perusing blood | ||
[2000/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER (USA) INC. 5905 Nathan Lane Plymouth Minnesota 55442 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER (USA) INC. 5905 Nathan Lane Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forman, Michael R. 472 Vadnais Lake Drive Vadnais Heights, Minnesota 55127 / US | 02 /
Helmus, Michael N. 4400 Lime Avenue Long Beach, California 90807 / US | 03 /
Stinson, Jonathan Swift 14815 4th Avenue North Plymouth, Minnesota 55447 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | ||
Former [2000/31] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/51] | Jansen, Götz Schneider (Europe) GmbH, Ackerstrasse 6 8180 Bülach / CH | Application number, filing date | 98201669.3 | 20.05.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | US19970049474P | 12.06.1997 Original published format: US 49474 P | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884064 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884064 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884064 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02, A61M25/00 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (EP,US);
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61M60/139 (EP,US);
A61M60/237 (EP,US);
A61M60/419 (EP,US);
A61M60/804 (EP,US);
A61M60/833 (EP,US);
A61M60/865 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] |
Former [2000/08] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ballonkatheter mit Impeller zur Blutförderung | [1998/51] | English: | Balloon Catheter with impeller for perfusing blood | [2000/39] | French: | Cathéter gonflable avec rouet pour la perfusion du sang | [1998/51] |
Former [1998/51] | Balloon Catheter with impeller for perusing blood | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4944722 (CARRIKER JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10,11 * column A; figures 1A,B *; | [A]US4957504 (CHARDACK WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-8,10,11 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5163910 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10,11 * column A; figures 1-4 *; | [AP]DE19622335 (VOELKER WOLFRAM PRIV DOZ DR ME [DE]) [AP] 1-8,10,11* column A; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US4581017 | US4909252 | US4944745 | US5092844 | US5163910 | US5370617 | US5405383 | WO9528983 |