EP0881649 - High temperature capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/49] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennings, Detlev, Dr. c/o Philips VerwaltungGmbH Röntgenstrasse 23 Hamburg 22335 / DE | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Schmalz, Günther, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Schmalz, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98201746.9 | 26.05.1998 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | DE1997122618 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19722618 | [1998/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881649 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/12, C04B35/468 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
C04B35/4682 (EP);
H01G4/1227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/32] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochtemperaturkondensator | [1998/49] | English: | High temperature capacitor | [1998/49] | French: | Condensateur à haute température | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/23] | 11.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.10.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]SU977437 ; | [XA]US4642732 (IKEDA MASAAKI ET AL) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 1-4 * * example 10; table 1 * [A] 3; | [XA]JPH03112860 ; | [X]JPH04260665 ; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 39, Database accession no. 83-775749, XP002075018 & SU977437 A 00000000 (ZAREMBA N E) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-4 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 25, Database accession no. 91-183149, XP002075017 & JPH03112860 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * examples 1-3; table 1 * [A] 2,3 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930128), vol. 017, no. 046, Database accession no. (C - 1021), & JP04260665 A 19920916 (TDK CORP) [X] 1-4 * example -; table 1 * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 44, Database accession no. 92-360546, XP002075019 [ ] * abstract * * example -; table 1 * |