EP0965273 - Method for preparing a coffee substitute [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerise, Léon En l'Areney, Route de Vevey 32 1807 Blonay / CH | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Vuille, Roman, et al Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [1999/51] | Application number, filing date | 98201834.3 | 03.06.1998 | [1999/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965273 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/44, A23L1/20 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
A23F5/44 (EP,KR);
A23C11/103 (EP);
A23L11/07 (EP);
A23L7/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kaffee-Ersatzmittels | [1999/51] | English: | Method for preparing a coffee substitute | [1999/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un succédané de café | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 28.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3762930 (MAHLMANN J) [A] 3* claim 1 *; | [A]US3925561 (HERSTEL HENK, et al) [A] 1-3 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4187324 (SHIRBROUN DARRELL B [US]) [A] 1 * example .; claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO8002636 (SCM CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * example 5 *; | [A]GB2087897 (FUELTEX OIL CHEM INT) [A] 1 * page 4, line 49 - line 53; example . *; | [XD]WO8603943 (GIVAUDAN & CIE SA [CH]) [XD] 1,2,4,5,8 * page 14, line 46 - page 15, line 5 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 29 *; | [A]EP0264789 (SCHAAF HEINZ NAHRUNGSMITTEL [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 22; claims 1-7 * |