EP0884410 - Four-Position open-shed jacquard machine. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Michel Van de Wiele Michel Van de Wielestraat 7/17 B-8510 Kortrijk (Marke) / BE | [1998/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dewispelaere, André C. Verschaevestraat 1 8510 Kortrijk/Marke / BE | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Leherte, Georges M.L.M. K.O.B. N.V. Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., Dr. K.O.B. n.v., Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 98201902.8 | 08.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | BE19970000507 | 12.06.1997 Original published format: BE 9700507 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884410 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884410 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D03C3/12, D03C3/06, D03C3/24 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
D03C3/06 (EP);
D03C3/12 (EP);
D03C3/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/34] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vierstellungs-Offenfach-Jacquardmaschine | [1998/51] | English: | Four-Position open-shed jacquard machine. | [1998/51] | French: | Mécanique jacquard à foule ouverte à quatre positions | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0665312 (STAUBLI VERDOL) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0627511 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]BE529019 (LEHEMBRE) [AD] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0723041 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV) [A] 1,3,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0736621 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV) [A] 1,3,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4101778 (OSKAR SCHLEICHER) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8701142 (LAURITSEN WILLIAM E N) [A] 8 * figures 16,17 * |