EP0893355 - Package container for beverages. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ueda, Michio 2-4, Minamijo Sanjimacho 2-chome Tokushima-shi Tokushima / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states Ueda, Michio 2-4, Minamijo Sanjimacho 2-chome Tokushima-shi, Tokushima / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau World Trade Center P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98202442.4 | 21.07.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | JP19970198097 | 24.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19809797 | JP19970247960 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: JP 24796097 | JP19980142781 | 25.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14278198 | [1999/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893355 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893355 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/02, B65D8/04 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
B65D11/04 (EP);
B65D3/26 (EP);
B65D5/746 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2000/15] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpackungsbehälter für Getränke | [1999/04] | English: | Package container for beverages. | [1999/04] | French: | Récipient d'emballage pour boissons | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 05.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/39] | 25.04.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4471882 (JOO KATSUHIRO) [A] 1,2,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4527699 (NAMBA KAZUYA ET AL) [A] 1,2,6-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO9532126 (SEALRIGHT CO INC) [A] 1,2,4-8 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 31 * * page 8, line 23 - line 36; figure - *; | [A]US5058801 (FREY ROBERT E ET AL) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract *; | [A]US2099055 (FERNGREN) [A] 1,2,6 * page 3, column L, line 3 - line 9; figures 1,10,11; claims 1-3 * |