EP0895394 - Radiotelephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1999/05] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Bening, Andreas, Dipl-Ing. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Kempf, Peter, Dr.-Ing. c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1999/05] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98202505.8 | 27.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | DE1997133530 | 02.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19733530 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895394 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895394 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72, H04B1/16 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/0287 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/3237 (EP,US);
G06F1/3287 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | H04M1/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/13] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mobilfunkgerät | [1999/05] | English: | Radiotelephone | [1999/05] | French: | Radiotéléphone | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0343528 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-7* column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 6; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US5369798 (LEE YOUNG-SUB [KR]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 16; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9510153 (PACIFIC COMM SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 8, line 7 - page 23, line 4 *; | [X]WO9603811 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 6, lines 22-24,29 * * page 8, line 24 - page 13, line 24; figures 1a,1b * |