EP0899482 - Continuously variable transmission and control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vukovich, William Joseph 5421 Pineview Close Ypsilianti, Michigan 48197 / US | 02 /
Koenig, Mellisa Mei 13B, Route de Boersch 67210 Obernai / FR | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/12] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/09] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98202562.9 | 30.07.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | US19970919026 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: US 919026 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899482 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899482 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899482 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
F16H61/66259 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/51] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stufenloses Getriebe und Steuerung | [1999/09] | English: | Continuously variable transmission and control | [1999/09] | French: | Transmission à variation continue et sa commande | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.11.2002 | GB | 30.07.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/45] | GB | 30.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0101151 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0111891 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]US4536171 (TANAKA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 14, line 32 - column 15, line 62; figure 9B * [A] 2; | [A]US4579021 (YAMAMURO SIGEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 15, line 60 - column 18, line 68; figures 13A,13B,23A,23B *; | [A]EP0258004 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XA]US4993284 (OSHIAGE KATSUNORI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 44; figures 10,11 * [A] 2 |