Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] |
21.01.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
14.01.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
14.01.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
10.09.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.08.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
05.03.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
09.01.2004 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.09.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.09.2003 | First examination report | |
02.09.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
24.04.2003 | Change - extension states | |
28.12.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
06.12.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
18.09.2002 | Renewal fee | |
05.04.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
11.09.2001 | Renewal fee | |
11.09.2000 | Renewal fee | |
22.01.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |