EP0900700 - Electrical distribution system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2004/17] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states Delco Electronics Europe GmbH Gustav-Nachtigal-Strasse 5 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neibecker, Niels Hackenbroicherstrasse 87 50769 Köln / DE | 02 /
Stadler, Peter Alter Schutzenplatz 12 57482 Wenden / DE | 03 /
Schubotz, Horst Am Dausendbusch 27 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98202669.2 | 07.08.1998 | [1999/10] | Priority number, date | GB19970018892 | 08.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9718892 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0900700 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0900700 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | [2002/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900700 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
B60R16/0238 (EP,US);
H05K1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/07] |
Former [1999/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisches Verteilersystem | [1999/10] | English: | Electrical distribution system | [1999/10] | French: | Système de distribution électrique | [1999/10] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2409660 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8034130U (KABELWERKE REINHAGEN GMBH.) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [Y]US5023752 (DETTER GARY C [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5040097 (STRIBEL HANS P [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0584592 (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4422434 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * |