EP0903320 - CIP-system for cleaning a filling plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JohnsonDiversey, Inc. 8310 16th Street Sturtevant Wisconsin 53177-0902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states JohnsonDiversey, Inc. 8310 16th Street Sturtevant, Wisconsin 53177-0902 / US | ||
Former [1999/18] | For:CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1999/12] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Michael G. c/o Diversey Lever Werk Kirchheimbolanden Morschheimer Strasse 12 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/42] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/12] | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M. Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 98202703.9 | 12.08.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | DE19971041242 | 18.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19741242 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903320 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903320 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/00 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
B67C3/001 (EP,US);
B08B9/0325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/36] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI | ||
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | CIP-System zur Reinigung einer Abfüllanlage | [1999/12] | English: | CIP-system for cleaning a filling plant | [1999/12] | French: | Système CIP pour le nettoyage d'une machine de remplissage | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0162968 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0408851 (ORTHMANN & HERBST [DE]); | [A]DE9404610U (KHS MASCH & ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 8 - line 16; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5329950 (BARINAS JOSEPH P [US]) | by applicant | DE4434407 | DE19508357 |