EP0907037 - Suspension damper polygonal reservoir tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/48] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pees, James Mitchell 1402 Streamside Drive Centerville, Ohio 45459 / US | 02 /
Bobinger, David Adolph 7851 Bethany Road Middletown, Ohio 45044 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98202917.5 | 01.09.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | US19970942424 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: US 942424 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907037 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907037 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907037 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/32, B60G13/00 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
B60G15/068 (EP,US);
F16F9/3235 (EP,US);
B60G2206/41 (EP,US);
B60G2206/422 (EP,US);
B60G2206/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2002/32] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polygonales Behälterrohr für Aufhängungsdämpfer | [1999/14] | English: | Suspension damper polygonal reservoir tube | [1999/14] | French: | Réservoir tubulaire polygonal pour amortisseur de suspension | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.08.2005 | GB | 10.11.2005 | ES | 21.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | FR | 30.09.2005 | |
GB | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | GB | 10.11.2005 | |
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | ES | 21.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0906798 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [E] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XA]GB1491251 (ARMSTRONG PATENTS CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 8 - line 31; figure - * * page 1, line 13 - line 41 * [A] 10; | [XY]GB2009883 (GIRLING LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [YA]GB2155579 (FORD MOTOR CO) [Y] 1,3 * page 1, line 12 - line 99; figure -; claims 1-5 * [A] 6-8; | [Y]US5607035 (FULKS GARY CHRIS [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * figures 7,8,10 *; | [Y]DE4232136 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6 * abstract *; | [Y]US4321988 (BICH RENE) [Y] 1,2,6 * figure - *; | [A]FR2755067 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1,2,9 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4582338 (COLANZI FRANCO [IT]) [A] 6 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US2025199 | US5638927 |