EP0893110 - Intraocular lens for optimal capsular bag fit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 8301 Mars Drive Waco TX 76712 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states ALLERGAN 8301 Mars Drive Waco, TX 76712 / US | ||
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states Allergan 8301 Mars Drive Waco, TX 76712 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sussman, Glenn R. 21942 Raintree Lane Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98203135.3 | 17.05.1995 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | US19940250726 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: US 250726 | [1999/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893110 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893110 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893110 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
A61F2/1613 (EP,US);
A61F2002/1683 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1999/04] | Title | German: | Intraokulare Linse für optimale Anpassung an den Kapselsack | [2001/26] | English: | Intraocular lens for optimal capsular bag fit | [1999/04] | French: | Lentille intraoculaire conçue pour s'adapter de manière optimale dans le sac capsulaire | [2001/26] |
Former [1999/04] | Intraoculare Linse für optimale Anpassung an den Kapselsack | ||
Former [1999/04] | Lentille intraoculaire concue pour s'adapter de manière optimale dans le sac capsulaire | Examination procedure | 13.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 16.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95919857.3 / EP0760637 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Request for further processing for: | 26.01.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.04.2002 | NL | 24.04.2002 | SE | 24.07.2002 | DE | 25.07.2002 | [2006/32] |
Former [2003/47] | NL | 24.04.2002 | |
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | NL | 24.04.2002 | |
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
DE | 25.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 24.04.2002 | |
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 24.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5197981 (SOUTHARD MICHAEL A [US]) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0125361 (KELMAN CHARLES D) [A] 1 * page 11, lines 34-35; figure - * |