EP0909738 - Sling system for sack lifting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIAS MURTRA S.A. Jordi Camp 94, Aptdo de Correos 278 08400 Granollers Barcelona / ES | For all designated states BROEDRENE MARKUSSENS METALVAREFABRIK A/S Sverigesvej 5-11 DK-7480 Vildbjerg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states Industrias Murtra S.A. Jordi Camp 94, Aptdo de Correos 278 08400 Granollers, Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states BROEDRENE MARKUSSENS METALVAREFABRIK A/S Sverigesvej 5-11 DK-7480 Vildbjerg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanellato, Cesare Antonio Gaudi, 75-1 08400 Granollers, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Bach, Karl Praestevaenget, 18 7480 Vildbjerg / DK | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A. Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 98203419.1 | 09.10.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | ES19970002162 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: ES 9702162 | [1999/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0909738 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0909738 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/18 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
B66C1/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/07] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schlinge zum Heben von Säcken | [1999/16] | English: | Sling system for sack lifting | [1999/16] | French: | Elinge pour lever des sacs | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1999 | Observations by third parties | 17.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/45] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4395067 (ROBIN PETER D L) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2634975 (SPANSET INTER AG) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1532961 (FISONS LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |