EP0919118 - Water supply for flowerpots, plant boxes and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wijtenhorst, Hendrik Woldweg 164 9606 PJ Kropswolde / NL | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde, Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 98204057.8 | 01.12.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | NL19971007659 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: NL 1007659 | [1999/22] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0919118 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01G27/04 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
A01G27/008 (EP);
A01G27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, PT, SE [2000/07] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserversorgung für Blumentöpfe, Pflanzenkästen und dergleichen | [1999/22] | English: | Water supply for flowerpots, plant boxes and the like | [1999/22] | French: | Alimentation en eau pour pots de fleurs, jardinières et similaires | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 03.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/02] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2255843 (CHATENOUD GILLES [FR]) [A] 1-3,7,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1301913 (SIMARD JEAN) [A] 1,2,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3525266 (FERS ZLATKO RAJMUND) [A] 1,2,10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2051538 (COTTON LTD E) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5535547 (BRUNENGO P JOHN [US]) [A] 2-5 * column 5, line 7 - column 7, line 19; figure - *; | [AD]FR2646750 (STROPPA MAURO [FR]) | by applicant | FR2646750 | GB2095083 |